AL SJR24 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-7)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Assigned Act No. 2021-36.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-7)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Assigned Act No. 2021-36.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Brown, Marie Hamrick, death mourned
Title
Brown, Marie Hamrick, death mourned
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-36. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 12:11 p.m. on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-25 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-02-25 | House | Jones (M) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-02-25 | House | Reported from Rules |
2021-02-11 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced |