AL SJR22 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Act No. 2018-48 on 02/05/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Montgomery, the capital of the State of Alabama, recognized

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Montgomery, the capital of the State of Alabama, recognized

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-30SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-48 on 02/05/2018.
2018-01-30SenateEnrolled
2018-01-30HouseSignature Requested
2018-01-30SenatePassed Second House
2018-01-30HouseJones motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-30HouseReported from Rules as Favorable
2018-01-23HouseReceived in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
2018-01-23SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-23SenateReported from Rules
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback