AL SJR20 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on 01/19/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on 01/19/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cooper, Rebecca Brewer, death mourned
Title
Cooper, Rebecca Brewer, death mourned
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on 01/19/2010 | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned Act No. 2010-21. | |
2010-01-19 | Signature Requested | |
2010-01-19 | Enrolled | |
2010-01-19 | Passed Second House | |
2010-01-19 | Guin motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-01-19 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-01-14 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced |