AL SJR19 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Assigned Act No. 2017-121.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Assigned Act No. 2017-121.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lewis Smith Lake, Alabama's premier lake, recognized
Title
Lewis Smith Lake, Alabama's premier lake, recognized
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Reed [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-121. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor at 9:55 a.m. on March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-03-15 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2017-03-02 | House | Boothe motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-02-21 | House | Boothe motion to Carry Over for one week adopted Voice Vote |
2017-02-21 | House | Wadsworth to carry over temporarily offered |
2017-02-21 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-02-21 | House | Rules Substitute Offered |
2017-02-21 | House | Reported from Rules with 1 substitute and carried over |
2017-02-09 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced |