AL SJR19 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on 01/19/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on 01/19/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joe L. Reed Acadome, Alabama State University Academic and Physical Education Complex, renamed
Title
Joe L. Reed Acadome, Alabama State University Academic and Physical Education Complex, renamed
Sponsors
Sen. Zeb Little [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-19 - House - Guin motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 52) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on 01/19/2010 | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned Act No. 2010-28. | |
2010-01-19 | Signature Requested | |
2010-01-19 | Enrolled | |
2010-01-19 | Passed Second House | |
2010-01-19 | Guin motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 2 | |
2010-01-19 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-01-14 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Little (Z) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced |