AL SJR164 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Patrick, Golden, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patrick, Golden, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Delivered to Governor at 1:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010
2010-04-22 Assigned Act No. 2010-674.
2010-04-22 Signature Requested
2010-04-22 Enrolled
2010-04-22 Passed Second House
2010-04-22 Guin motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2010-04-22 Reported from Rules
2010-04-21 Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
2010-04-14 Bedford motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2010-04-14 Introduced

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback