AL SJR13 | 2010 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-14 - Delivered to Governor at 11:30 a.m. on 12/14/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Tom Bible Memorial Highway, portion of State Highway 200 within City of Piedmont, named

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tom Bible Memorial Highway, portion of State Highway 200 within City of Piedmont, named

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-12-14 Delivered to Governor at 11:30 a.m. on 12/14/2010
2010-12-14 Assigned Act No. 2010-777.
2010-12-14 Signature Requested
2010-12-14 Enrolled
2010-12-14 Passed Second House
2010-12-13 Gaston motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2010-12-13 Reported from Rules
2010-12-10 Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
2010-12-09 Beason motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2010-12-09 Reported from Rules
2010-12-08 Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback