AL SJR11 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Assigned Act No. 2018-431.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Assigned Act No. 2018-431.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ethics, Code of Ethics Reform and Clarification Commission, created
Title
Ethics, Code of Ethics Reform and Clarification Commission, created
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-431. |
2018-03-22 | House | Rules first Substitute Offered |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 3:09 p.m. on March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2018-03-22 | House | Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-22 | House | Rules zeroeth Substitute Offered |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported from Rules with 1 substitute and |
2018-03-01 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules zeroeth Substitute Offered |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules with 1 substitute and |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |