AL SJR105 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on March 25, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on March 25, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local constitutional amendments, election date on proposed amendments in Colbert County (Act 2009-390) and Franklin County (Act 2009-309), prohibiting use of human sewage biosolids as fertilizer, election date set at June 2010 primary election
Title
Local constitutional amendments, election date on proposed amendments in Colbert County (Act 2009-390) and Franklin County (Act 2009-309), prohibiting use of human sewage biosolids as fertilizer, election date set at June 2010 primary election
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on March 25, 2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned Act No. 2010-362. | |
2010-03-25 | Signature Requested | |
2010-03-25 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-25 | Passed Second House | |
2010-03-25 | Guin motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-25 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-03-23 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2010-03-11 | Bedford motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced |