AL SJR104 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-12-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:36 p.m. on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-12-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:36 p.m. on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Shady Grove Missionary Baptist Church of Bessemer, commended
Title
Shady Grove Missionary Baptist Church of Bessemer, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Forwarded to Governor at 3:36 p.m. on June 9, 2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Assigned Act No. 2011-664. | |
2011-06-09 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-09 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-09 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-09 | Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-06-09 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-06-02 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2011-04-27 | Dunn motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-04-27 | Introduced |