AL SB97 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Nursing, Board of, anti-competitive rule making, immunity provided, Sec. 34-21-2.1 added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing, Board of, anti-competitive rule making, immunity provided, Sec. 34-21-2.1 added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HousePending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions
2018-03-21HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
2018-03-15SenateEngrossed
2018-03-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 854
2018-03-15SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 853
2018-03-15SenateHealth and Human Services first Substitute Offered
2018-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB97&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB97-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB97-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/189665-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/189878-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=596855&VOTE=853&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=596856&VOTE=854&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback