AL SB94 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
Pending: House Ways and Means Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Education, National Guard, a person does not have to be a resident for Alabama Commission on Higher Education to reimburse if in National Guard, include high school students simultaneously enrolled, Federal funds paid to the student may not be considered to determine benefits under Education Trust Fund Appropriation Act, Secs. 16-64-2, 31-10-3 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education, National Guard, a person does not have to be a resident for Alabama Commission on Higher Education to reimburse if in National Guard, include high school students simultaneously enrolled, Federal funds paid to the student may not be considered to determine benefits under Education Trust Fund Appropriation Act, Secs. 16-64-2, 31-10-3 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2018-03-13SenateEngrossed
2018-03-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 793
2018-03-13SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 792
2018-03-13SenateDial first Substitute Offered
2018-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-06SenateDial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-06SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-02-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback