AL SB9 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Schools, Foundation Program Fund, determination of cost to include student growth as an allowable cost, allowance for non-virtual and virtual students, provisions for increases based on increase in average daily membership in the current school year deleted, Secs. 16-13-231, 16-13-232 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools, Foundation Program Fund, determination of cost to include student growth as an allowable cost, allowance for non-virtual and virtual students, provisions for increases based on increase in average daily membership in the current school year deleted, Secs. 16-13-231, 16-13-232 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 74 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt Roll Call 73 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - SBIR: Elliott motion to Roll Call 72 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateEngrossed
2021-02-24HousePending third reading on day 9 Favorable from Ways and Means Education
2021-02-24HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed
2021-02-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 74
2021-02-04SenateElliott motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 73
2021-02-04SenateFinance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered
2021-02-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-02-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2021-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1613231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1613232Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB9&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB9-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB9-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/209098-2.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41560.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41572.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41948.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41915.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=643514&VOTE=72&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB9&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=643522&VOTE=73&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=643523&VOTE=74&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback