AL SB84 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
Pending: House Ways and Means General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State Parking Deck Authority, maturity date for bonds further provided for, specifications of state parking deck altered, transfer to General Fund from Authority's reserve fund, Secs. 41-10-490, 41-10-497, 41-10-500, 41-10-502, 41-10-513, 41-10-516 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Parking Deck Authority, maturity date for bonds further provided for, specifications of state parking deck altered, transfer to General Fund from Authority's reserve fund, Secs. 41-10-490, 41-10-497, 41-10-500, 41-10-502, 41-10-513, 41-10-516 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 57 Abs: 29) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
2017-04-11SenateEngrossed
2017-04-11SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 514
2017-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-06SenateDial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-06SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 450
2017-04-06SenateDial Second Substitute Offered
2017-04-06SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-03-09SenateDial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-03-09SenateDial motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2017-03-09SenateDial first Substitute Further Consideration
2017-03-09SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-02-23SenateDial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-02-23SenateDial first Substitute Offered
2017-02-23SenateDial motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2017-02-23SenateFinance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
2017-02-23SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-02-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2017-02-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB84&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB84-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB84-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/181936-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/181936-3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/183924-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=560136&VOTE=76&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=566791&VOTE=450&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=567806&VOTE=514&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback