AL SB81 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Assigned Act No. 2018-91.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clay Co., co. courthouse, removal of state courts from historical Clay Co. Courthouse prohibited, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clay Co., co. courthouse, removal of state courts from historical Clay Co. Courthouse prohibited, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - House - Johnson (R) motion to Local Application (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-91.
2018-02-13SenateForwarded to Secretary of State on February 13, 2018 at 4:08 pm on February 13, 2018
2018-02-13SenateEnrolled
2018-02-13HouseSignature Requested
2018-02-13SenatePassed Second House
2018-02-13HouseJohnson (R) motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 297
2018-02-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 296
2018-02-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-25HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2018-01-25SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 104
2018-01-25SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-23SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback