AL SB79 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Sullivan intended to vote "Yea"
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Employees' Retirement System Board of Control, membership revised, diversity language included, terms of service further provided for, Sec. 36-27-23 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employees' Retirement System Board of Control, membership revised, diversity language included, terms of service further provided for, Sec. 36-27-23 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 798 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 797 (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Ingram motion to Adopt Roll Call 796 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 545 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 544 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 543 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 107 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - SBIR: Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 106 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseSullivan intended to vote "Yea"
2021-04-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 798
2021-04-13HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 797
2021-04-13HouseWays and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
2021-04-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-04-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2021-03-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
2021-03-11SenateEngrossed
2021-03-11SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 545
2021-03-11SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 544
2021-03-11SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2021-03-11SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 543
2021-03-11SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2021-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-02-09SenateGudger motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2021-02-09SenateGudger motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 107
2021-02-09SenateGovernmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2021-02-09SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2021-02-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2021-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB119 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Ingram motion to Substitute SB79 for HB119 adopted Voice Vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362723Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB79&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB79-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB79-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/209561-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211333-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211503-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/212724-2.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41557.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41575.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42339.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42646.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=644115&VOTE=106&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB79&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=644117&VOTE=107&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=651099&VOTE=543&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=651101&VOTE=544&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=651102&VOTE=545&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657880&VOTE=796&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20SB79&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657882&VOTE=797&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657883&VOTE=798&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback