AL SB79 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Income tax credits, increase for rural physicians and dentists, Secs. 40-18-130 to 40-18-132, inclusive, am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax credits, increase for rural physicians and dentists, Secs. 40-18-130 to 40-18-132, inclusive, am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-30HouseWays and Means Education first Amendment Offered
2018-01-30HousePending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Ways and Means Education with 1 amendment
2018-01-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 214
2018-01-30SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 213
2018-01-30SenateDial Amendment Offered
2018-01-30SenateDial motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-30SenateFinance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered
2018-02-01HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2018-01-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-01SenateEngrossed
2018-01-30SenateDial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-30SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-01-23SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB79&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB79-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB79-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/189594-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190835-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=584470&VOTE=213&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=584471&VOTE=214&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback