AL SB72 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Assigned Act No. 2022-264.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Assigned Act No. 2022-264.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public contracts, exemption from certain bid requirements for certain educational entities providing meals under the Child Nutrition Program, Secs. 16-13B-2.1, 41-16-51.2 added.
Title
Public contracts, exemption from certain bid requirements for certain educational entities providing meals under the Child Nutrition Program, Secs. 16-13B-2.1, 41-16-51.2 added.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 763 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 681 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 680 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - HBIR: Wilcox motion to Adopt Roll Call 679 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 33 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - SBIR: Williams motion to Adopt Roll Call 32 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 681 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 680 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - HBIR: Wilcox motion to Adopt Roll Call 679 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 33 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - SBIR: Williams motion to Adopt Roll Call 32 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-264. |
2022-03-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-29 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 763 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2022-03-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 681 |
2022-03-17 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 680 |
2022-03-17 | House | Wilcox Amendment Offered |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 33 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 13B | 2.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 16 | 51.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |