AL SB72 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Assigned Act No. 2021-274.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Assigned Act No. 2021-274.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District attorneys supernumerary status, qualifications, removing minimum years of service and age requirement, Sec. 12-17-213 am'd.
Title
District attorneys supernumerary status, qualifications, removing minimum years of service and age requirement, Sec. 12-17-213 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 800 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Simpson motion to Adopt Roll Call 799 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 627 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 626 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 623 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 622 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Simpson motion to Adopt Roll Call 799 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 627 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 626 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 623 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 622 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-274. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 800 |
2021-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 627 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Barfoot motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 626 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Barfoot motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Barfoot Amendment Offered |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Barfoot motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 623 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Barfoot Amendment Offered |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB173 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed