AL SB71 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Assigned Act No. 2018-141.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Construction Recruitment Institute, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction Recruitment Institute, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-141.
2018-02-20HouseSignature Requested
2018-02-20SenateEnrolled
2018-02-20SenatePassed Second House
2018-02-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 391
2018-02-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
2018-01-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 182
2018-01-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-16SenateSingleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-16SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-01-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback