AL SB70 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Ways and Means Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Ways and Means Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School of Cyber Technology and Engineering, granted same sovereign immunity and participation in Educators Liability Trust Fund as provided for other public K-12 schools, board of education, administrators, and staff, Secs. 16-28A-6, added; Secs. 16-22-4.1, 36-1-12 am'd.
Title
School of Cyber Technology and Engineering, granted same sovereign immunity and participation in Educators Liability Trust Fund as provided for other public K-12 schools, board of education, administrators, and staff, Secs. 16-28A-6, added; Secs. 16-22-4.1, 36-1-12 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Livingston [R] | Sen. Gerald Allen [R] | Sen. Tom Butler [R] | Sen. Sam Givhan [R] |
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] | Sen. Clay Scofield [R] | Sen. Thomas Whatley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 621 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SBIR: Livingston motion to Adopt Roll Call 620 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SBIR: Livingston motion to Adopt Roll Call 620 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Ways and Means Education |
2021-04-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 621 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB282 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 22 | 4.1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 28A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |