AL SB596 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, learners' licenses, applicant authorized to provide passport as identification and proof of age, Sec. 32-6-8 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, learners' licenses, applicant authorized to provide passport as identification and proof of age, Sec. 32-6-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Public Safety | |
2010-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1079 | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Industrial Development and Recruitment |