AL SB59 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Assigned Act No. 2022-248.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Assigned Act No. 2022-248.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pardons and Paroles Board, establishment of pilot program for small business development for ex-offenders, appropriations, at J.F. Ingram State Technical College, Sec. 41-29-320 repealed and superseded
Title
Pardons and Paroles Board, establishment of pilot program for small business development for ex-offenders, appropriations, at J.F. Ingram State Technical College, Sec. 41-29-320 repealed and superseded
Sponsors
Sen. Bobby Singleton [D] | Sen. William Beasley [D] | Sen. Clyde Chambliss [R] | Sen. Vivian Figures [D] |
Sen. Greg Reed [R] | Sen. Rodger Smitherman [D] | Sen. Thomas Whatley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 688 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - HBIR: Bracy motion to Adopt Roll Call 687 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 62 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 61 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - HBIR: Bracy motion to Adopt Roll Call 687 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 62 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 61 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-248. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-29 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-03-17 | House | Hurst intended to vote "Yea" |
2022-03-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 688 |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 62 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |