AL SB59 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1085
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Municipal corporations, ordinances, issuance of summons and complaint in lieu of custodial arrest, further provided for, Sec. 11-45-9.1 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal corporations, ordinances, issuance of summons and complaint in lieu of custodial arrest, further provided for, Sec. 11-45-9.1 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1085 (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1084 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1083 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - HBIR: England motion to Adopt Roll Call 1082 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 901 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt Roll Call 900 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt Roll Call 899 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - SBIR: Melson motion to Adopt Roll Call 898 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1085
2021-04-29HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1084
2021-04-29HouseEngland Amendment Offered
2021-04-29HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1083
2021-04-29HouseCounty and Municipal Government Amendment Offered
2021-04-29HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-04-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2021-04-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
2021-04-08SenateEngrossed
2021-04-08SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 901
2021-04-08SenateMelson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 900
2021-04-08SenateMelson Amendment Offered
2021-04-08SenateMelson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 899
2021-04-08SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2021-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-02-24SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2021-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11459.1Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB59&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB59-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB59-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210500-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213061-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213511-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213786-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41879.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41980.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42684.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42868.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=656882&VOTE=898&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB59&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=656884&VOTE=899&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=656888&VOTE=900&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=656891&VOTE=901&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=662706&VOTE=1082&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20SB59&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=662714&VOTE=1083&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=662720&VOTE=1084&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=662721&VOTE=1085&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback