AL SB58 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Delivered to Governor at 4:08 p.m. on April 17, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Delivered to Governor at 4:08 p.m. on April 17, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Law Institute, funding, authorized to receive funds from governmental and other sources, appropriation for use for Law Institute purposes, Sec. 29-8-6 added
Title
Alabama Law Institute, funding, authorized to receive funds from governmental and other sources, appropriation for use for Law Institute purposes, Sec. 29-8-6 added
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] | Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Delivered to Governor at 4:08 p.m. on April 17, 2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Assigned Act No. 2012-219. | |
2012-04-17 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 787 | |
2012-04-17 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government | |
2012-02-14 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 53 | |
2012-02-14 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 52 | |
2012-02-14 | Taylor Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |