AL SB572 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 11:26 a.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 11:26 a.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Marshall Co., Tennessee Valley Authority, payments in-lieu-of-taxes, distrib. to Marshall County Economic Development Office altered, Act 86-564, 1986 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Marshall Co., Tennessee Valley Authority, payments in-lieu-of-taxes, distrib. to Marshall County Economic Development Office altered, Act 86-564, 1986 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Delivered to Governor at 11:26 a.m. on May 10, 2012 | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-480. | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1462 | |
2012-05-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1114 | |
2012-05-08 | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |