AL SB563 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 4:00 p.m. on May 9, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 4:00 p.m. on May 9, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jackson Co., Tennessee Valley Authority payments in lieu of taxes, amounts to Economic Development Authority incr., amounts to muns. reduced, Act 2011-611 and Act 2011-654, 2011 Reg. Sess., repealed; Act 79-473, 1979 Reg. Sess. amended and reenacted
Title
Jackson Co., Tennessee Valley Authority payments in lieu of taxes, amounts to Economic Development Authority incr., amounts to muns. reduced, Act 2011-611 and Act 2011-654, 2011 Reg. Sess., repealed; Act 79-473, 1979 Reg. Sess. amended and reenacted
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2012-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Delivered to Governor at 4:00 p.m. on May 9, 2012 | |
2012-05-09 | Assigned Act No. 2012-421. | |
2012-05-09 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-09 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-09 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1402 | |
2012-05-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1009 | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |