AL SB550 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 11:30 a.m. on April 22, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 11:30 a.m. on April 22, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Franklin Co., court costs, additional in criminal cases in circuit, district, and municipal courts, distrib. for new judicial building and jail
Title
Franklin Co., court costs, additional in criminal cases in circuit, district, and municipal courts, distrib. for new judicial building and jail
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Bedford motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 50 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 44 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 50 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 44 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Delivered to Governor at 11:30 a.m. on April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned Act No. 2010-733. | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2010-04-22 | Bedford motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1178 | |
2010-04-22 | Concurrence Requested | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1047 | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1046 | |
2010-04-14 | Local Legislation first Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-14 | Morrow motion to temporarily carry over adopted voice vote | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-04-13 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-04-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 663 | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |