AL SB543 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Pending third reading on day 31 Favorable from Government Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Alabama Criminal Justice Information Center Commission and the Alabama Criminal Justice Information Center, members, operation, powers, duties, fees, crime of misuse of ACJIC information established, Alabama Statistical Analysis Center established, background checks by licensing agencies, interstate exchange of criminal history information, ratification of compact, penalties, Secs. 41-9-590, 41-9-591, 41-9-592, 41-9-594, 41-9-597, 41-9-600, 41-9-601, 41-9-621, 41-9-622, 41-9-623, 41-9-630 am'd. (2010-20820)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alabama Criminal Justice Information Center Commission and the Alabama Criminal Justice Information Center, members, operation, powers, duties, fees, crime of misuse of ACJIC information established, Alabama Statistical Analysis Center established, background checks by licensing agencies, interstate exchange of criminal history information, ratification of compact, penalties, Secs. 41-9-590, 41-9-591, 41-9-592, 41-9-594, 41-9-597, 41-9-600, 41-9-601, 41-9-621, 41-9-622, 41-9-623, 41-9-630 am'd. (2010-20820)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Pending third reading on day 31 Favorable from Government Appropriations
2010-04-22 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-04-08 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Appropriations
2010-04-08 Engrossed
2010-04-08 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 896
2010-04-08 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 895
2010-04-08 Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered
2010-04-08 Third Reading Passed
2010-03-30 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2010-03-11 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback