AL SB525 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jackson, corp. limits alt.
Title
Jackson, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2010-04-13 | Keahey motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-04-06 | Marsh request Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted. | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-03-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-09 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |