AL SB504 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Forwarded to Governor on April 22, 2010 at 1:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Elmore Co., sheriff, service of process, contracts for authorized, fees imposed on all criminal and civil documents served, distrib. to sheriff's fund (2010-20920)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elmore Co., sheriff, service of process, contracts for authorized, fees imposed on all criminal and civil documents served, distrib. to sheriff's fund (2010-20920)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - Senate - Preuitt motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2010-04-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - BIR (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Forwarded to Governor on April 22, 2010 at 1:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010
2010-04-22 Assigned Act No. 2010-730.
2010-04-22 Enrolled
2010-04-22 Signature Requested
2010-04-22 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2010-04-22 Preuitt motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1179
2010-04-22 Concurrence Requested
2010-04-13 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 941
2010-04-13 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 940
2010-04-13 Mask first Substitute Offered
2010-04-13 Third Reading Passed
2010-04-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-04-06 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2010-04-06 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 657
2010-04-06 BIR adopted Roll Call 656.
2010-04-06 Third Reading Passed
2010-03-25 Request to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted
2010-03-25 Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2010-03-23 Postponed call of the Chair.
2010-03-23 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-03-04 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB504
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/SB504-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/SB504-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=384359&VOTE=656&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=384360&VOTE=657&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=387302&VOTE=940&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=387304&VOTE=941&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=391567&VOTE=1179&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback