AL SB503 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:00 p.m. on June 2, 20111
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:00 p.m. on June 2, 20111
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jackson Co., Tennessee Valley Authority, payments in-lieu-of-taxes, distrib. to legislative delegation office, schools, municipalities, Discretionary Fund Committee, Act 79-473, 1979 Reg. Sess.; Act 88-292, 1988 Reg. Sess.; Act 99-550, 1999 Reg. Sess. repealed (2011-21127)
Title
Jackson Co., Tennessee Valley Authority, payments in-lieu-of-taxes, distrib. to legislative delegation office, schools, municipalities, Discretionary Fund Committee, Act 79-473, 1979 Reg. Sess.; Act 88-292, 1988 Reg. Sess.; Act 99-550, 1999 Reg. Sess. repealed (2011-21127)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 34 Abs: 44) [FAIL]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 62) [FAIL]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 62) [FAIL]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 2:00 p.m. on June 2, 20111 | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-654. | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2011-06-02 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 938 | |
2011-06-02 | Concurrence Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1056 | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1055 | |
2011-06-02 | Local Legislation first Substitute Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-06-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation | |
2011-05-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 782 | |
2011-05-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |