AL SB50 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Assigned Act No. 2015-530.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Homewood, corp. limits alt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homewood, corp. limits alt.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 55 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2015-08-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-11SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-530.
2015-08-11HouseSignature Requested
2015-08-11SenateEnrolled
2015-08-10SenatePassed Second House
2015-08-10HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 42
2015-08-10HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-06HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation
2015-08-06SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 38
2015-08-06SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-05SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback