AL SB498 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Government, audits by Examiners of Public Accounts, payment for audit by agency board, or department being audited, cost set by department, Secs. 41-5-14, 41-5-24 am'd
Title
State Government, audits by Examiners of Public Accounts, payment for audit by agency board, or department being audited, cost set by department, Secs. 41-5-14, 41-5-24 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Livingston motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Livingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1267 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |