AL SB497 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, factor presence nexus standard based on business activity established for purpose of being subject to income taxation in the state, in state residence or domicile for individuals, businesses organized in state are subject to tax, nonresident individuals and businesses organized out of state that do business in the state are subject to state tax on income, Sec. 40-18-31.2 added
Title
Taxation, factor presence nexus standard based on business activity established for purpose of being subject to income taxation in the state, in state residence or domicile for individuals, businesses organized in state are subject to tax, nonresident individuals and businesses organized out of state that do business in the state are subject to state tax on income, Sec. 40-18-31.2 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered |
2015-06-03 | House | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Ways and Means Education with 1 amendment |
2015-06-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-05-28 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1264 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |