AL SB497 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Forwarded to Governor on May 10, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Forwarded to Governor on May 10, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, campaign finance reporting, eliminate duplicate and multiple filings, provide full month and weeks reporting periods, Sec. 17-5-8 am'd
Title
Elections, campaign finance reporting, eliminate duplicate and multiple filings, provide full month and weeks reporting periods, Sec. 17-5-8 am'd
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Brooks [R] | Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Forwarded to Governor on May 10, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. on May 10, 2012 | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-477. | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1482 | |
2012-05-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 828 | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |