AL SB494 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Forwarded to Executive Department on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Forwarded to Executive Department on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Optometric Scholarship Awards, Board of, funds of board not to revert at end of fiscal year, Sec. 34-22-61 am'd.
Title
Optometric Scholarship Awards, Board of, funds of board not to revert at end of fiscal year, Sec. 34-22-61 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Forwarded to Executive Department on May 10, 2012 | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-476. | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1502 | |
2012-05-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1064 | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |