AL SB476 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Assigned Act No. 2012-337.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Assigned Act No. 2012-337.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clay Co., tobacco tax, distrib. county legislative delegation office provided for, Secs. 45-14-244.02, 45-14-244.05 am'd.; Sec. 45-14-244.04 reenacted and added
Title
Clay Co., tobacco tax, distrib. county legislative delegation office provided for, Secs. 45-14-244.02, 45-14-244.05 am'd.; Sec. 45-14-244.04 reenacted and added
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - House - Laird motion to Reconsider (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 51) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - House - Laird motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2012-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - House - Laird motion to Reconsider (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 51) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - House - Laird motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2012-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-337. | |
2012-05-10 | Second House Concurs in Veto Override | |
2012-05-10 | House of Origin Overrides Veto | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding adopted Roll Call 1472 | |
2012-05-10 | Laird motion to Reconsider adopted Roll Call 1471 | |
2012-05-10 | Laird Motion in Writing filed | |
2012-05-09 | Laird motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding lost Roll Call 1450 | |
2012-05-09 | House of Origin Overrides Veto | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding adopted Roll Call 1119 | |
2012-05-08 | Executive Veto Offered | |
2012-04-26 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-26 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-26 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 990 | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation | |
2012-04-19 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 646 | |
2012-04-19 | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 645 | |
2012-04-19 | Dial Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |