AL SB46 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Assigned Act No. 2015-527.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Administrative Procedure Act, rules, review of disapprovals by joint committee further provided for, prospective application of Act 2015-291, Sec. 41-22-23 am'd; Act 2015-291, 2015 Reg. Sess., am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative Procedure Act, rules, review of disapprovals by joint committee further provided for, prospective application of Act 2015-291, Sec. 41-22-23 am'd; Act 2015-291, 2015 Reg. Sess., am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-08-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-06 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-11SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-527.
2015-08-11HouseSignature Requested
2015-08-11SenateEnrolled
2015-08-11SenatePassed Second House
2015-08-11HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 56
2015-08-11HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-06SenateEngrossed
2015-08-06House
2015-08-06SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 41
2015-08-06SenateSanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 40
2015-08-06SenateSanford Amendment Offered
2015-08-06SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-05SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback