AL SB456 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ninth Judicial Circuit, DeKalb and Cherokee Counties, investigator, pistol and badge upon retirement after 10 or more years of service, investigators, employment pursuant to general law, relating to arrest and service powers of investigators repealed, Sec. 45-10-80 repealed
Title
Ninth Judicial Circuit, DeKalb and Cherokee Counties, investigator, pistol and badge upon retirement after 10 or more years of service, investigators, employment pursuant to general law, relating to arrest and service powers of investigators repealed, Sec. 45-10-80 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2013-315. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1282 |
2013-05-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 775 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |