AL SB455 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child custody, rebuttable presumption that change of principal residence not in best interest of child, application to initial determination of custody, Secs. 30-3-161, 30-3-169.7 am'd.
Title
Child custody, rebuttable presumption that change of principal residence not in best interest of child, application to initial determination of custody, Secs. 30-3-161, 30-3-169.7 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Zeb Little [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 substitute | |
2010-04-14 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 875 | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |