AL SB453 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eye care providers including optometrists and ophthalmologists, health insurance policies or plans, prohibited from requiring provider to purchase certain supplies, Access to Eye Care Act, Sec. 27-56-4 am'd.
Title
Eye care providers including optometrists and ophthalmologists, health insurance policies or plans, prohibited from requiring provider to purchase certain supplies, Access to Eye Care Act, Sec. 27-56-4 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2010-04-08 | Smitherman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-03-04 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |