AL SB450 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Forwarded to Governor on April 22, 2010 at 1:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Jackson Co. and DeKalb Co., Industrial Development Authority, established to promote property near Northeast Alabama Community College, members

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jackson Co. and DeKalb Co., Industrial Development Authority, established to promote property near Northeast Alabama Community College, members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - Senate - Barron motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Forwarded to Governor on April 22, 2010 at 1:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010
2010-04-22 Assigned Act No. 2010-728.
2010-04-22 Enrolled
2010-04-22 Barron motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1181
2010-04-22 Signature Requested
2010-04-22 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2010-04-22 Concurrence Requested
2010-04-14 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1063
2010-04-14 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1062
2010-04-14 County and Municipal Government first Substitute Offered
2010-04-14 Third Reading Passed
2010-03-03 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2010-02-25 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
2010-02-25 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 406
2010-02-25 Third Reading Passed
2010-02-23 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-02-18 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB450
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/SB450-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/SB450-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=374839&VOTE=406&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=389169&VOTE=1062&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=389173&VOTE=1063&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=391577&VOTE=1181&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback