AL SB447 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Rereferred from Mobile County Legislation to Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Rereferred from Mobile County Legislation to Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prichard, Water Works and Sewer Board, merger with Mobile Area Water and Sewer System, assumption of assets and debt, const. amend. (2010-20914)
Title
Prichard, Water Works and Sewer Board, merger with Mobile Area Water and Sewer System, assumption of assets and debt, const. amend. (2010-20914)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Rereferred from Mobile County Legislation to Commerce | |
2010-04-13 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation | |
2010-04-13 | Engrossed | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1027 | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1026 | |
2010-04-13 | Figures first Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-04 | Figures motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-04 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-03-03 | Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-03 | Unfinished Business | |
2010-02-23 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-18 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Economic Expansion and Trade |