AL SB439 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Assigned Act No. 2015-287.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Assigned Act No. 2015-287.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cullman Co., parks, fees, and prizes for contests authorized, Cullman Co. Park Event Disbursement Fund established
Title
Cullman Co., parks, fees, and prizes for contests authorized, Cullman Co. Park Event Disbursement Fund established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 63 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-287. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-05-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1024 |
2015-05-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 988 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |