AL SB437 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-448.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-448.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Non-nexus sellers use tax, method for remittance on behalf of customer, provided, Non-Nexus Use Tax Remittance Act, Secs. 40-23-191 to 40-23-199, inclusive, added
Title
Non-nexus sellers use tax, method for remittance on behalf of customer, provided, Non-Nexus Use Tax Remittance Act, Secs. 40-23-191 to 40-23-199, inclusive, added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-448. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1457 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2015-06-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1274 |
2015-06-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1273 |
2015-06-04 | House | Ways and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2015-06-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-05-26 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1125 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1124 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |