AL SB436 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community Development, additional class of community development district, established, incorporation and powers of districts, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B2, 35-8B-3 am'd
Title
Community Development, additional class of community development district, established, incorporation and powers of districts, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B2, 35-8B-3 am'd
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2012-05-01 | Whatley Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-05-01 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |