AL SB434 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:55 a.m. on May 9, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:55 a.m. on May 9, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Florence, corp. limits alt.
Title
Florence, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Irons [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 69 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 11:55 a.m. on May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-244. |
2013-05-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1175 |
2013-05-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 773 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |