AL SB429 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 7:55 p.m. on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 7:55 p.m. on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Vital statistics, stillborn child, parent listed on report of fetal death authorized to request Certificate of Birth Resulting in Stillbirth from State Registrar, procedures for issuance, State Board of Health to administer
Title
Vital statistics, stillborn child, parent listed on report of fetal death authorized to request Certificate of Birth Resulting in Stillbirth from State Registrar, procedures for issuance, State Board of Health to administer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Delivered to Governor at 7:55 p.m. on June 9, 2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Assigned Act No. 2011-706. | |
2011-06-09 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-09 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-09 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1163 | |
2011-06-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 729 | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |