AL SB42 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Assigned Act No. 2015-526.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Open Meetings, members of governmental bodies may participate in meetings and deliberation electronically, exceptions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open Meetings, members of governmental bodies may participate in meetings and deliberation electronically, exceptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-08-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 80 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-08-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-11SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-526.
2015-08-11HouseSignature Requested
2015-08-11SenateEnrolled
2015-08-11HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2015-08-11SenateOrr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 71
2015-08-11SenateConcurrence Requested
2015-08-11HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 55
2015-08-11HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 54
2015-08-11HouseWays and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
2015-08-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-08-11HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-06HouseRereferred from Ethics and Campaign Fund to Ways and means General Fund
2015-08-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance
2015-08-05SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 25
2015-08-05SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-04SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback